IL SB2031 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Provides that for a specified written agreement provided by a resident to a facility under the Act, the agreement may authorize the resident's representative to represent the resident's interests in securing and maintaining Medicaid long-term care benefits, including banking records, redeterminations, appeal proceedings, and legal challenges, or that the resident may choose another individual or entity to perform these functions, which shall require a separate written agreement. Provides that an authorization granted by a resident under a specified provision shall not be diminished or terminated by the death of the resident. Effective immediately.
Title
NURSING HM CARE-RESIDENT'S REP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Reported Back To Public Health; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-29 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Long Term Care |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 2-202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |