IL SB2028 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that each school bus operated by a public or private primary or secondary school transporting students enrolled in grade 12 or below for a school related athletic event or other school approved extracurricular activity shall be registered as a school bus, comply with school bus driver permit requirements, comply with the minimum liability insurance requirements, and comply with all special requirements pertaining to school buses in the Code. Provides that a school bus that operates under the provision may be used to transport passengers other than students if certain conditions are met.
Title
VEH CD-SCHOOL BUS-ACTIVITY
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0241 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-18 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |