IL SB2010 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this Amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 1, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 6, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |