IL SB2007 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0633
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Removes specified provisions containing requirements for cottage food operations. Contains requirements for cottage food operations that sell fermented or acidified food and baked goods with cheese. Contains requirements for the preparation and packaging of products by a cottage food operation. Provides that food and drink produced by a cottage food operation shall be sold directly to consumers for their own consumption and not for resale. Provides that only food that is non-potentially hazardous may be shipped. Prohibits a cottage food product from being shipped out of State. Requires each cottage food product that is shipped to be sealed in a manner that reveals tampering. Provides that a local health department shall register any eligible cottage food operation that meets the requirements of the provisions and shall issue a certificate of registration with an identifying registration number to each registered cottage food operation. Provides that a local health department may establish a self-certification program for cottage food operators to affirm compliance with applicable laws, rules, and regulations. Provides that registration shall be completed annually and the local health department may impose a fee not to exceed $50. Provides for inspection, fees, and penalties in the event of a consumer complaint or foodborne illness outbreak, an imminent health hazard, or a product that has been found to be misbranded, adulterated, or not in compliance with the conditions for cottage food operations. Provides that a local health department that receives a consumer complaint or a report of foodborne illness related to a cottage food operator in another jurisdiction shall refer the complaint or report to the local health department where the cottage food operator is registered. Contains an exemption from the requirements for a non-potentially hazardous baked good for sale by a religious, charitable, or nonprofit organization for fundraising purposes. Contains a home rule preemption. Contains other provisions. Effective January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD HANDLING-COTTAGE FOOD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-27SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0633
2021-08-27SenateEffective Date January 1, 2022
2021-08-27SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Health; 014-000-000
2021-05-25SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Health
2021-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-24SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler
2021-05-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2021
2021-05-21SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2021-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2021-05-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-001
2021-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2021-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-05-12HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-05-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000
2021-05-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2021-05-03HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2021-04-23HouseArrived in House
2021-04-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2021-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Health; 015-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2021-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health
2021-04-06SenateReported Back To Health; 005-000-000
2021-04-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2021-03-24SenateTo Subcommittee on Public Health
2021-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Health
2021-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
4106254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2007&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2007.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2007eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2007enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0633.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2007sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2007ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2007_04222021_062000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB2007_05202021_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB2007ham001_05302021_036000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback