IL SB1996 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Residential Real Property Disclosure Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning completion and delivery of the seller's disclosure statement.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0536 |
2011-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2011 |
2011-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 035-014-000 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-003-000 |
2011-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2011-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 26, 2011 |
2011-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 |
2011-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-001-000 |
2011-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Timothy L. Schmitz |
2011-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2011-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2011-04-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-007-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Noland |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-001-000 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Judiciary |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 77 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |