IL SB1993 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0037
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Insurance Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois by transferring all powers, duties, rights, responsibilities, personnel, books, records, papers, documents, property (real and personal), contracts, causes of action, and pending business of the Insurance Compliance Division within the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission to the Department of Insurance. Provides that, when reports or notices are to be made or given or papers or documents furnished or served by any person to or upon the Insurance Compliance Division, they shall be made, given, furnished, or served in the same manner to or upon the Department of Insurance. Provides that the amendatory Act does not affect any act done, ratified, or canceled, any right occurring or established, or any action or proceeding had or commenced in an administrative, civil, or criminal cause by the Insurance Compliance Division before the amendatory Act takes effect. Makes other changes. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Replaces references to the Insurance Compliance Division with references to the Department of Insurance. In provisions concerning Department of Insurance oversight, changes the date before which insurers licensed to write workers compensation coverage in the State must record and report specified information concerning claims from March 1 to June 1 of each year. Deletes a provision stating that the fraud and insurance non-compliance unit shall procure and implement a system using advanced analytics for the detection and prevention of fraud, waste, and abuse. Effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INSURANCE COMPLIANCE DIVISION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0037
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date July 1, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-21HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000
2021-05-14HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-06HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-05HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000
2021-04-28HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-22HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2021-04-22HouseArrived in House
2021-04-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2021-04-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021
2021-04-13SenateSecond Reading
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
2021-03-24SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2014051405-40New CodeSee Bill Text
82030525.5Amended CodeCitation Text
82030529.2Amended CodeCitation Text
8203054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback