IL SB1959 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Reduced Filing Fees for Seniors and Veterans Act. Contains a statement of legislative purpose. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that beginning January 1, 2020, the Supreme Court may, by rule, implement a program to offer a reduced filing fee of 50% the rate for the filing of civil cases by a person, regardless of the income of the person, who is either a: (1) senior citizen, aged 65 and older; or (2) member of the United States Armed Forces, the Illinois National Guard, or the Reserves of the United States Armed Forces. Provides that the applicant shall apply at the time of filing and present his or her valid State identification or driver's license or armed forces identification card. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO FILING-SENIOR/VETERAN
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Civil Rights |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 5-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1959&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1959.htm |