IL SB1952 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-15)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Downstate Teachers and State Universities Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires an employer to make an additional employer contribution for a participant whose earnings for any academic year used to determine the final rate of earnings exceed the amount of his or her earnings with the same employer for the previous academic year by more than 6% (instead of 3%). Makes conforming changes. Amends the School Code. Allows each school district to provide a salary to a student teacher employed by the district and fix the amount of that salary. Removes the requirement of the passage of a test of basic skills for obtaining certain Professional Educator Licenses and Educator Licenses with Stipulations. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TEACHERS-VARIOUS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; 006-001-000
2019-05-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; by Voice Vote
2019-05-14HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-14HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-05-14HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2019-05-14HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School; Rep. Gregory Harris
2019-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
2019-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-05-14HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2019-05-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2019-05-02HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-05-01HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2019-04-30HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2019-04-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-04-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2019-04-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-04-12HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-12HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-04-12HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-04-11HouseArrived in House
2019-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-005-000
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2019-04-10SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 014-000-000
2019-04-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2019-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-03-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019
2019-03-20SenateDo Pass Education; 013-000-000
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-03-12SenatePostponed - Education
2019-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Education
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-20Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-30Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-35Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-50Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-55Amended CodeCitation Text
105524-8.5New CodeSee Bill Text
105527A-10Amended CodeCitation Text
40515-155Amended CodeCitation Text
40516-158Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback