IL SB1946 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that an insurance company may, after completing a record search for any owner of a vehicle or a lienholder of record, obtain free of any lien a junking certificate in the insurance company's name by submitting an application to the Secretary of State. An insurance company may also obtain free of any lien a salvage certificate for a vehicle of specified 8 model years that has completed an inspection for a rebuilt vehicle under the Code by submitting an application to the Secretary. Defines "model year". Provides that a salvage dealer may, after completing a record search for any owner of a vehicle or a lienholder of record, obtain a junking certificate or a salvage certificate by submitting an application to the Secretary. Defines "salvage dealer". Provides that a vehicle owner or a lienholder may send notice of dispute of title within 30 days after notice of transfer of title is sent by the insurance company or salvage dealer to the owner or lienholder. Provides that no dealer licensed under the Code shall sell a vehicle for which a rebuilt title has been issued from another jurisdiction without first obtaining an Illinois certificate of title with a "REBUILT" notation under the Code. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-SALVAGE CERTIFICATE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0104
2017-08-11SenateEffective Date November 9, 2017
2017-08-11SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-16SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-19SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-000-000
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 011-000-000
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Insurance
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-117.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62553-117.3New CodeSee Bill Text
62555-104.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback