IL SB1942 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Reproductive Health Act. Provides that every individual has a fundamental right to make autonomous decisions about one's own reproductive health. Provides that every individual who becomes pregnant has a fundamental right to continue the pregnancy and give birth or to have an abortion, and to make autonomous decisions about how to exercise that right. Provides that a fertilized egg, embryo, or fetus does not have independent rights under the law, of this State. Provides prohibited State actions. Provides that a party aggrieved by a violation of the Act may bring a civil lawsuit. Provides that a health care professional shall report each abortion performed to the Department of Public Health. Limits home rule powers. Repeals provisions regarding abortion in the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act, the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act, and the Injunction Article of the Code of Civil Procedure. Repeals the Illinois Abortion Law of 1975, the Partial-birth Abortion Ban Act, and the Abortion Performance Refusal Act. Makes corresponding changes in the Children and Family Services Act, the Counties Code, the Medical Practice Act of 1987, the Vital Records Act, the Criminal Code of 2012, and the Rights of Married Persons Act. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Provides that information and records held by the Department collected under the Reproductive Health Act is exempt from inspection and copying. Amends the Ambulatory Surgical Treatment Center Act. Provides that that term "ambulatory surgical treatment center" does not include any facility in which the performance of abortion procedures is limited to those performed without general, epidural, or spinal anesthesia. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides insurance requirements for the coverage of abortion. Makes corresponding changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, and the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Provides that operative surgery does not include abortions performed without general, epidural, or spinal anesthesia, and other gynecological procedures related to abortions. Amends the Environmental Act. Provides that tissue and products from an abortion or miscarriage may be buried, entombed, or cremated. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-03-28SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-03-22SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2019-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2019-02-22SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205055Amended CodeCitation Text
21052Amended CodeCitation Text
21053Amended CodeCitation Text
21056.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
2151255-3Amended CodeCitation Text
21516510Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.4Amended CodeCitation Text
2155356z.4aNew CodeSee Bill Text
2256022Amended CodeCitation Text
2256036Amended CodeCitation Text
2256515-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-35Amended CodeCitation Text
2256565-43Amended CodeCitation Text
4105351Amended CodeCitation Text
410709Repealed CodeCitation Text
415556.1Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
53756.11Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-3013Amended CodeCitation Text
720512-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-1.2Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-2.1Amended CodeCitation Text
72059-3.2Amended CodeCitation Text
720510ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
720513ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
735511-107.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
73558-802Amended CodeCitation Text
74530ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7506515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback