IL SB1933 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Provides that the State Board of Elections and the Office of the Secretary of State shall establish an automatic voter registration program pursuant to an interagency contract and jointly-adopted rules. Provides that an application for a driver's license, other than a temporary visitor's driver's license or a State identification card, shall also serve as an application to register to vote; allow an update to registration; and perform other specified functions. Requires specified agencies to provide certain information regarding registration. Establishes designated automatic voter registration agencies; and requires the establishment of dual-purpose applications to register to vote. Sets forth provisions and requirements for the State Board of Elections regarding the program. Amends the Freedom of Information Act to exempt certain information. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC-AUTO VOTER REGISTRATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-05-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Manar
2017-05-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Manar
2017-05-05SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
2017-05-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 017-000-000
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Manar
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
2017-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 010-003-001
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-03-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2017-02-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1051-16New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.1New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.2New CodeSee Bill Text
1051A-16.6Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-16.8Amended CodeCitation Text
1051A-16.9New CodeSee Bill Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62552-105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback