IL SB1932 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires a school board to consult with law enforcement and security experts in the design and planning stages of the construction of any new school building or any additions to or major remodeling of an existing school building.
Title
SCH CD-SCH CONSTRUCT-CONSULT
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Sen. Pamela Althoff [R] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-001-000 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-003-000 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.48 | New Code | See Bill Text |