IL SB1932 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the School Choice Act and amends the Illinois Income Tax Act and the School Code. Establishes the School Choice Program. Provides that under the program, the custodian of a qualifying pupil is entitled to a School Choice Voucher to pay for qualified education expenses at a participating Chicago nonpublic elementary school. Requires the principal of each low-performing school and of each overcrowded school in the Chicago school district to notify custodians of qualifying pupils of the availability of vouchers. Sets forth provisions concerning a request for a voucher, the issuance and payment of a voucher, the amount and renewal of a voucher, pupil assessment, the State longitudinal data system, and funding. Provides that students receiving vouchers are considered nonpublic school students who have been voluntarily placed in a private setting. Provides that the amount of a redeemed voucher shall not be considered base income and shall not be taxable for Illinois income tax purposes. Requires the State Board of Education to submit a report to the General Assembly. Provides criminal penalties for certain violations. Requires the State Board to adopt rules to implement the Act. Effective June 30, 2011.
Title
SCHOOL CHOICE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] | Sen. Chris Lauzen [R] | Sen. James Meeks [D] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] |
Rep. Shane Cultra [R] | Sen. Dan Duffy [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ron Sandack |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 006-003-000 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 006-004-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 007-003-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |