IL SB1926 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Consolidation Commission Act. Establishes the Local Government Consolidation Commission to create a recommended list of units of local government to be abolished or consolidated. Provides that the Commission shall submit its recommended list to the General Assembly by no later than April 1, 2012. Sets forth the requirements for the recommended list. Provides that the General Assembly may disapprove the list of the Commission in whole, but may not disapprove of specific types of units of local government or specifically named units of local government on the list, within 30 calendar days after each chamber next convenes after the list is submitted to the General Assembly, by adoption of a resolution by a record vote of the majority of the members elected in each house. Provides that if the recommended list is not disapproved by the General Assembly within the time period for disapproval, then the Legislative Reference Bureau shall prepare for introduction a revisory bill effecting the changes in the statutes as may be necessary to conform the statutes to the changes in law made by the recommended list. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOVT CONSOLIDATION COMSN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Executive |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1926&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1926.htm |