IL SB1907 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections to adopt rules establishing a procedure to send vote by mail ballots via electronic transmission and enable a voter with a disability to independently and privately mark a ballot using assistive technology in order for the voter to vote by mail. Provides that if a request for an accessible vote by mail ballot from a voter with a disability arrives after the election authority begins transmitting vote by mail ballots and instructions to voters, the election authority shall transmit the ballot, instructions, and balloting materials to the voter within 3 business days after receipt of the application. Requires a vote by mail ballot provided to a voter with a disability to be received and marked as required by all vote by mail ballots. Makes corresponding changes throughout the Code. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-MAIL BALLOT/DISABILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-24 | Senate | To Executive- Elections |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 19-2.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 19-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 19-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 24A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1907&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1907.htm |