IL SB1906 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, the Medical Practice Act of 1987, and the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions related to the Financial Institution Fund, Insurance Financial Regulation Fund, the Insurance Producer Administration Fund, and the Illinois State Medical Disciplinary Fund, provides that the appropriation Department shall calculate its administrative expenses related to the enforcement of the Acts associated with the funds and, as soon after those calculations are made as is practical, amounts in those funds that are in excess of those calculated administrative expenses shall be credited to licensees under those Acts for the following year. Effective immediately.
Title
REGULATORY FUNDS-CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 408 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 60 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1906&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1906.htm |