IL SB1906 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Provides that the Act applies to certain projects located outside of the State, if the project involves property or facilities that are owned, operated, leased, or managed by an entity located within the State. Sets forth criteria for approving out-of-State projects. Provides that the Authority shall not provide financing for any project, or portion of a project, located outside of the United States. Provides that the Authority shall not provide financing that constitutes an indebtedness of the State for any project, or portion of a project, located outside of the State. Provides that the Illinois Finance Authority may approve an application to finance or refinance a project located outside of the State only if the Authority has the ability to issue at least another $1,000,000,000 of bonds after giving effect to the financing or refinancing or the out-of-state project. Proposes that the Authority shall not provide financing that uses State volume cap under Section 146 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 for a project located outside of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE AUTHORITY-PROJECTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-29 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0103 | |
2009-07-29 | Effective Date January 1, 2010 | |
2009-07-29 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 052-000-001 | |
2009-05-30 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-05-30 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary G. Dahl | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Energy; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Energy | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-05-29 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 - May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-28 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 3 | |
2009-05-28 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a) | |
2009-05-28 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 012-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-26 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-21 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler | |
2009-05-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-05-19 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-19 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-19 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Winters | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-07 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-004-000 | |
2009-04-23 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-001 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 2, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Clayborne | |
2009-03-31 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce; 006-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-24 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Commerce; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |