IL SB1905 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Consumer Coverage Disclosure Act. Provides that an employer that provides group health insurance coverage to its employees shall, upon hire, annually thereafter, and upon request from an employee, provide all employees eligible for the coverage a written list of the covered benefits included in the group health insurance coverage in a format that easily compares those covered benefits with the essential health insurance benefits required of individual health insurance coverage regulated by the State of Illinois. Directs the Department of Insurance to provide information outlining the essential benefits and other benefits under coverage regulated under State law. Provides for enforcement by the Department of Labor. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties. Effective immediately.
Title
FAMILY FERTILITY DISCLOSE INS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0630 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Effective Date August 27, 2021 |
2021-08-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-006-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-05-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-007-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-003-000 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Labor; 018-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Labor |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |