IL SB1902 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fair Act. Provides that the Department of Agriculture may establish locally held bank accounts in adequately protected financial institutions to receive and disburse security deposits for the rental of facilities at each State fairground during non-fair time periods. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
AGR-STATE FAIR ACCOUNTS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0325 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William E. Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 210 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |