IL SB1899 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-16 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Eliminates the requirement that the State and county highway authorities adopt strategies and practices that include the delivery of 5-year programs, annual programs, and the establishment of coordination councils in the locales. Provides that each utility shall designate in writing to the Secretary of Transportation or his or her designee an agent for notice and the delivery of State or county projects. Provides that the 90-day deadline for removal, relocation, or modification of the ditches, drains, track, rails, poles, wires, pipe line, or other equipment shall be enforceable by the State or county, instead of by a coordination council. Provides that the total cost of modification may include changes made during construction to avoid or minimize impact to known, or unknown utility's facilities. Provides that costs incurred by the State or county due to the untimely relocation of the utility's facilities, and the State's or county's need to meet a project completion date, shall be paid by the utility upon request from the State or county.
Title
HWY CD–UTILITY PROJECTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 9-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1899&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB1899.htm |