IL SB1898 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 24 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that a contract or a proposed contract for the sale or lease of consumer merchandise or services may not include a provision waiving the consumer's right to make any statement regarding the seller or lessor or the employees or agents of the seller or lessor or concerning the merchandise or services. Makes it an unlawful practice to threaten or to seek to enforce a provision made unlawful by the new provisions or to otherwise penalize a consumer for making a protected statement. Provides that a waiver of the new provisions is contrary to public policy and is void and unenforceable. Provides that the new provisions may not be construed to prohibit or limit a person or business that hosts online consumer reviews or comments from removing a statement that is otherwise lawful to remove.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONSUMER STATEMENTS PROTECTED

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-24SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-05-17HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2017-05-17HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-10HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 007-001-001
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8155052TTTNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback