IL SB1896 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0875
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Rights of Crime Victims and Witnesses Act. Provides that the victim of the crime for which the prisoner has been sentenced shall receive reasonable written notice not less than 30 (rather than 15) days prior to the parole hearing. Provides that if a victim or concerned citizen has registered an objection to parole of an inmate, the victim or concerned citizen may receive a copy of the most recent written submissions that the inmate filed in requesting parole. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Changes procedures relating to parole hearings. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIME VICTIMS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-10-29 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-10-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-22 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0875 | |
2010-01-22 | Effective Date January 22, 2010 | |
2010-01-22 | Governor Approved | |
2009-11-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-10-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-10-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 | |
2009-10-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 013-000-000 | |
2009-10-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive | |
2009-10-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine | |
2009-10-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-10-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-10-29 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-10-29 | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - October 30, 2009 | |
2009-10-29 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-10-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-10-29 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-10-29 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-28 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-10-28 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-10-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-28 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-10-28 | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | |
2009-10-28 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-10-08 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-10-08 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2009 | |
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-02 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-04-02 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |