IL SB1894 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0358
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that children and stepchildren, in addition to the spouse and parents, of a police officer or firefighter who has died in the line of duty may be issued special license plates.
Title
SPEC PLATES-POLICE/FIREFIGHTER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0358 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-04-10 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 018-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 3-641 | Amended Code | Citation Text |