IL SB1888 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that beginning July 1, 2023, and each State fiscal year thereafter, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall increase the Prospective Payment System rates for federally qualified health centers by $100,000,000 using an alternative payment method acceptable to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services and a trade association representing a majority of federally qualified health centers operating in Illinois, including a rate increase that is an equal percentage increase to the rates paid to each federally qualified health center. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
DHFS-FQHC-PPS RATE INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1888&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1888.htm |