IL SB1886 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, and the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act. Reduces felony penalties for possession of cannabis, controlled substances, and methamphetamine to misdemeanors. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that in the case of a person who is, at the time of the effective date of the amendatory Act, incarcerated for a felony offense under the Cannabis Control Act, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, or the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act that has been subsequently reclassified as a misdemeanor, the sentencing court, the Director of Corrections, or the incarcerated person may make a motion to recall the original sentence issued and re-sentence the person to a misdemeanor sentence. Creates the Justice Reinvestment Fund in the State treasury for: (1) addressing the destabilizing effects that high incarceration rates have had on families and communities; (2) targeting the community conditions that perpetuate the cycle of crime; (3) providing formerly incarcerated persons a better chance to succeed outside of prison; and (4) providing support to victims. Provides that on or before August 31, 2018, and on or before August 31 of the next 9 fiscal years thereafter, the Comptroller shall transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Justice Reinvestment Fund 85% of the total savings calculated by the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council from the reduction of the prison population as a result of the reduced sentences provided by the amendatory Act. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes.
Title
DRUG PENALTIES-POSSESS-REDUCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 550 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 646 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-9 | New Code | See Bill Text |