IL SB1877 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Provides that instead of furnishing a copy of the trust instrument to a person other than the beneficiary, the trustee may furnish to the person a certification of trust containing specified information. Provides that a certification of trust may be signed or otherwise authenticated by any trustee and need not contain the dispositive terms of the trust. Includes other provisions governing the form and content of the certification of trust. Contains provisions concerning persons who act in reliance upon a certification of trust. Provides that the new provisions do not limit the right of a person to obtain a copy of the trust instrument in a judicial proceeding concerning the trust. Effective immediately.
Title
TRUSTS & TRUSTEE-CERTIFICATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0337 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2015 |
2015-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-001 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-05-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Silverstein |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |