IL SB1876 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Landlord and Tenant Act. Provides that a lessor of a dwelling unit shall disclose to lessees risks of flooding. Provides that the Act only applies to a dwelling unit located on or below the second story. Provides that, for every lease or rental agreement entered into on or after July 1, 2019, the lessor shall disclose that: (1) the property is located in a special flood hazard area or an area of potential flooding, if the lessor has actual knowledge of that fact; and (2) the lessor's insurance does not cover the loss of the lessee's personal possessions and it is recommended that the lessee consider purchasing renter's insurance and flood insurance to insure his or her possessions from loss due to fire, flood, or other risk of loss. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY-FLOOD DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1876&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1876.htm |