IL SB1874 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Removes limitations on the rank of policemen who may serve on the board of trustees. Provides that the members of the board of trustees employed by the City (rather than specifying certain policemen) shall be detailed by the Police Superintendent to the office of the board for the duration of their terms as trustees. Makes changes in provisions concerning election of the policemen members. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 5-BOARD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Pensions and Investments |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 5-178 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-179 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1874&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1874.htm |