IL SB1868 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that after the disposition of a criminal case or in any criminal case where a final judgment in the case was not entered due to the death of the defendant, and when a confiscated weapon is no longer needed for evidentiary purposes, and when in due course no legitimate claim has been made for the weapon, a weapon transferred to a law enforcement agency may be sold by the law enforcement agency at public auction under the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Amends the Domestic Violence: Order of Protection Article of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that upon expiration of the period of safekeeping of a firearm of a respondent against whom an order of protection was issued, if the firearms or Firearm Owner's Identification Card cannot be returned to respondent because the respondent cannot be located, fails to respond to requests to retrieve the firearms, or is not lawfully eligible to possess a firearm, upon petition from the local law enforcement agency, the court may order the local law enforcement agency to sell the firearm at public auction under the provisions of the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Amends the Law Enforcement Disposition of Property Act. Provides that weapons that have been confiscated as a result of having been abandoned or illegally possessed may be sold at public auction under the Act.
Title
CONFIS OF WEAP-LAW ENFORCEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 1030 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1868&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1868.htm |