IL SB1843 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Council of State Governments Act. Authorizes the majority and minority leadership of the Senate and the House of Representatives, as well as members of legislative committees and commissions, to attend appropriate meetings of the Council of State Governments and to pay the annual membership fee needed to maintain membership in the Council. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNCIL OF STATE GOVERNMENTS
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1843&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1843.htm |