IL SB1839 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
Pending: House Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Coal Mining Act. Provides that a mine operator must provide the number of self-contained self-rescuer devices as required by the mine's approved Mine Safety and Health Administration Emergency Response Plan. Removes language concerning plan requirements submitted for approval to the Mining Board. Provides that rescue chambers must be provided and located within 1,000 (rather than 3,000) feet from the nearest working face of each working section of a mine. Provides that outby rescue chambers must be provided at distances and locations approved in the mine's approved Mine Safety and Health Administration Emergency Response Plan. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COAL MINING-SELF RESCUERS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-16HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-16HouseArrived in House
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-001
2017-05-16SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-05-12SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2017-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 016-000-000
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22570511.08Amended CodeCitation Text
22570511.09Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback