IL SB1830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides in cases in which the prosecution attempts to introduce evidence of incriminating statements made by the accused to or overheard by an informant, the prosecution shall disclose at least 30 days prior to any relevant evidentiary hearing or trial (rather than timely disclose in discovery): (1) the complete criminal history of the informant; (2) any deal, promise, inducement, or benefit that the offering party has made or will make in the future to the informant; (3) the statements made by the accused; (4) the time and place of the statements, the time and place of their disclosure to law enforcement officials, and the names of all persons who were present when the statements were made; whether at any time the informant recanted that testimony or statement and, if so, the time and place of the recantation, the nature of the recantation, and the names of the persons who were present at the recantation; (6) other cases in which the informant testified, provided that the existence of such testimony can be ascertained through reasonable inquiry and whether the informant received any promise, inducement, or benefit in exchange for or subsequent to that testimony or statement; and (7) any other information relevant to the informant's credibility. Provides that if, at any time, a law enforcement or prosecutorial official has reason to believe that a previous statement or testimony proffered by an individual acting as an in-custody informant may be untruthful or unreliable, this information shall be disclosed through notification to the defendant, his or her attorney of record or the public defender's office, the prosecutor's office, and the court for all cases in which the informant offered statements or testimony. Provides that this provision applies to any criminal proceeding for first degree murder, intentional homicide of an unborn child, second degree murder, voluntary manslaughter of an unborn child, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide of an unborn child, drug-induced homicide, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, or aggravated arson (rather than a capital case). Makes other changes.
Title
CRIM PRO-INFORMANT TESTIMONY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 80 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1119 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 080-031-000 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-11-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 054-001-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-033-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-21 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner |
2017-05-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-05-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 115-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |