IL SB1830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides in cases in which the prosecution attempts to introduce evidence of incriminating statements made by the accused to or overheard by an informant, the prosecution shall disclose at least 30 days prior to any relevant evidentiary hearing or trial (rather than timely disclose in discovery): (1) the complete criminal history of the informant; (2) any deal, promise, inducement, or benefit that the offering party has made or will make in the future to the informant; (3) the statements made by the accused; (4) the time and place of the statements, the time and place of their disclosure to law enforcement officials, and the names of all persons who were present when the statements were made; whether at any time the informant recanted that testimony or statement and, if so, the time and place of the recantation, the nature of the recantation, and the names of the persons who were present at the recantation; (6) other cases in which the informant testified, provided that the existence of such testimony can be ascertained through reasonable inquiry and whether the informant received any promise, inducement, or benefit in exchange for or subsequent to that testimony or statement; and (7) any other information relevant to the informant's credibility. Provides that if, at any time, a law enforcement or prosecutorial official has reason to believe that a previous statement or testimony proffered by an individual acting as an in-custody informant may be untruthful or unreliable, this information shall be disclosed through notification to the defendant, his or her attorney of record or the public defender's office, the prosecutor's office, and the court for all cases in which the informant offered statements or testimony. Provides that this provision applies to any criminal proceeding for first degree murder, intentional homicide of an unborn child, second degree murder, voluntary manslaughter of an unborn child, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide, involuntary manslaughter and reckless homicide of an unborn child, drug-induced homicide, aggravated criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, or aggravated arson (rather than a capital case). Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM PRO-INFORMANT TESTIMONY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-11HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-08HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-08HouseArrived in House
2017-05-05SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7255115-21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback