IL SB1819 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a public contractor, employee of a public contractor, or a person seeking a public contract also commits the offense of public contractor misconduct when he or she knowingly or intentionally seeks or receives compensation or reimbursement for goods and services he or she purported to deliver or render, but failed to do so pursuant to the terms of the contract, to the unit of State or local government or school district. Provides that any person convicted of the offense or a similar offense in any state of the United States which contains the same elements of public contractor misconduct shall be barred for 10 years from the date of conviction from contracting with, employment by, or holding public office with the State or any unit of local government or school district. Provides that the Attorney General or the State's Attorney in the county where the principal office of the unit of local government or school district is located may bring a civil action on behalf of any unit of State or local government to recover a civil penalty from any person who knowingly engages in conduct which violates the statute in treble the amount of the monetary cost to the unit of State or local government or school district involved in the violation. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-PUBLIC CONTRACTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-21 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |