IL SB1811 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Administration Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to comply with the federal Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2023 (Public Law 117-328) and submit a State plan to the U.S. Department of Agriculture's Food and Nutrition Service on the replacement of stolen SNAP benefits for recipients whose benefits were stolen through card skimming, card cloning, or other similar fraudulent methods. Provides that upon federal approval, the Department shall adopt any rules necessary to implement the State plan and replace stolen SNAP benefits for recipients whose LINK cards were fraudulently compromised. Provides that any data the Department is required to submit to the U.S. Department of Agriculture's Food and Nutrition Service on the scope and frequency of SNAP fraud via card skimming, card cloning, or other similar fraudulent methods shall be shared with the Attorney General's Office for criminal prosecution. Provides that subject to appropriation, until the Department receives federal approval for a State plan on the replacement of stolen SNAP benefits, the Department shall replace a SNAP recipient's stolen benefits within 14 days of the Department receiving a report of the theft, if the Department determines that the SNAP recipient's LINK card was fraudulently compromised due to no fault of the recipient. Permits the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-STATE PLAN-SNAP FRAUD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1811&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB1811.htm |