IL SB1807 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality shall not enter into any new contracts, but may extend a contract or renew a contract, with any other unit of local government, by intergovernmental agreement or otherwise, or with any business or person relating to the collecting and final disposition of general construction or demolition debris. Provides that a municipality shall not provide by ordinance for any methods that award a franchise for the collection or final disposition of general construction or demolition debris. Provides that, in municipalities with a population under 1,000,000, a franchise shall not be awarded to any private entity for the collection of general construction or demolition debris from residential or non-residential locations. Provides that a franchise entered into before the effective date of the amendatory Act may be renewed or extended irrespective of whether the franchise or contract automatically renews or is amended.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-CONSTRUCT & DEMO DEBRIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Harmon
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Harmon
2017-04-27SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-31SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2017-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65511-19-1Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-19-2Amended CodeCitation Text
65511-19-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback