IL SB1806 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0226
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Inspector License Act and the Regulatory Sunset Act. Permits the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation to disclose information and documents related to an examination or investigation of a licensee or applicant only to law enforcement officials, other regulatory agencies that have an appropriate regulatory interest as determined by the Secretary, or a party presenting a lawful subpoena to the Department. Provides that any formal complaint against a licensee filed with the Department or an order issued by the Department against a licensee or applicant shall be a public record. Allows the Department to take action, including imposing fines not to exceed $25,000 per violation, if the individual meets the requirements for grounds for disciplinary action. Grants the Department authority to petition the Attorney General or local State's Attorney office where a violation occurs to enjoin the violation or order enforcement compliance with this Act. Provides that, on a showing of a possible violation, the Department may compel an applicant or a licensee to submit to a physical or mental examination. Repeals provisions concerning the Home Inspector Advisory Board. Creates peer review advisors that the Department may authorize to investigate complaints, revise the licensing examination at the direction of the Department, review training and qualifications of applicants, and interview witnesses, the complainant, and any licensees involved in an alleged matter. Provides the Department the authority to issue subpoenas, administer oaths at Department hearings, or petition the circuit courts to order the attendance and testimony of witnesses. Makes other changes. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to extend the Home Inspector License Act from January 1, 2012 to January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
HOME INSPECTOR LICENSE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0226 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Effective Date July 28, 2011 |
2011-07-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-31 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2011-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2011 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2011 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |