IL SB1798 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0418
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires each school district to create, maintain, and implement an age-appropriate policy on sexual harassment that must be posted on the school district's website and, if applicable, any other area where policies, rules, and standards of conduct are currently posted in each school and must be included in the school district's student code of conduct handbook.
Title
SCH CD-BULLY/HARASSMENT POLICY
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0418 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-009-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-008-000 |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Rose |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.69 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |