IL SB1796 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-16 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that a State policeman may elect to convert service credit earned under the Article to eligible creditable service under the alternative retirement annuity formula by filing a written election with the Board and making a specified contribution. Provides that the conversion of service credit to eligible creditable service is not subject to provisions that limit the amount of eligible creditable service that may be established to 12 years. Provides that a State policeman may elect to establish eligible creditable service under the alternative retirement annuity formula for up to 5 years of service as a person employed by a participating municipality to perform police duties under the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article, a county corrections officer, or a court services officer under the Cook County Article by filing a written application with the Board and making a specified contribution. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-SERS-ALTERNATIVE FORMULA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 14-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-152.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |