IL SB1795 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning tax abatements after acquisition by a governmental unit, provides that the abatement applies to property acquired by a governmental unit under a blight reduction or abandoned property program administered by the Illinois Housing Development Authority. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-BLIGHT REDUCTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-006-000
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2017-05-24HouseReported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee;
2017-05-24HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
2017-03-29SenateDo Pass Local Government; 006-000-000
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-95Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback