IL SB1788 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Diversifying Higher Education Faculty in Illinois Act. Provides that the Program Board created to administer the grant program authorized by the Act shall be comprised of 11 (rather than 21) members. Effective immediately.
Title
HGHER ED-DIVERSE FACULTY GRANT
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Monica Bristow [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0354 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 930 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |