IL SB1788 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the State's Attorney Privacy Act. Prohibits a person, business, association, or government agency from publicly posting or displaying the personal information of a State's Attorney after the State's Attorney has made a written request to not post or display the personal information. Allows for injunctive or declaratory relief. Prohibits a person, business, or association from soliciting, selling, or trading on the Internet a State's Attorney's personal information with the intent to pose an imminent and serious threat to the health and safety of the State's Attorney or the State's Attorney's immediate family. Makes it a Class 3 felony to knowingly post personal information of a State's Attorney or the State's Attorney's immediate family, if the person knows or reasonably should know the posting poses an imminent and serious threat to the health and safety of the State's Attorney or his or her immediate family, and the posting is a proximate cause of bodily injury or death of the State's Attorney or a member of his or her immediate family. Provides an exemption from the felony offense for employees of a government agency acting in good faith, while carrying out a public function. Makes corresponding changes in the Freedom of Information Act, the Election Code, the Illinois Identification Card Act, and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE'S ATTORNEY PRIVACY ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-10.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 335 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 335 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 6-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1788&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB1788.htm |