IL SB1786 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning child care co-payments, provides that the amount of a family's co-payment shall not exceed the sum of certain percentages of the family's countable income, based on the relationship of that income to the federal poverty level. Provides that a family with countable income below 50% of the federal poverty level shall have a co-payment of $1 per week. Requires a reduction of co-payments within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, and requires that these limitations on co-payments be fully in effect no later than July 1, 2010. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-PUBLIC AID-CHILD CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-03-11 | To Human Services Subcommittee on Medicaid & Provider Rate Reform | |
2009-03-09 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-06 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Human Services | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1786&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1786.htm |