IL SB1769 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires each school superintendent to create a program to ensure that students attending the schools that he or she manages cannot access those schools' grounds for at least 12 hours after those grounds are treated with a lawn care product. Requires each district superintendent to appoint a Lawn Care Coordinator whose duty it shall be (i) to implement that program, (ii) to supervise the provision of notice under subdivision (f)(2) of Section 3 of the Lawn Care Products Application and Notice Act, and (3) if the district adopts a pesticide-free turf care program, to supervise that program. Amends the Lawn Care Products Application and Notice Act. Requires applicators for hire to provide additional types of information to customers. Requires the owners or operators of day care centers to provide parents with one of two types of notice before applying pesticide or having pesticide applied to day center grounds (now, only school districts must provide that notice). Requires the Illinois Department of Public Health to inform school boards and the owners and operators of day care centers about these requirements. Requires the Illinois Department of Public Health to report violations to the Department of Agriculture for enforcement. Effective immediately.
Title
PESTICIDE APPLICATION-SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Sen. William Delgado [D] | Sen. Susan Garrett [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Schoenberg [D] |
Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0424 | |
2009-08-13 | Effective Date August 13, 2009 | |
2009-08-13 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-16 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-05-18 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 | |
2009-05-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-05-15 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David E. Miller | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Julie Hamos | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-05-14 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-29 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-04-28 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-28 | Do Pass / Short Debate Environmental Health Committee; 010-003-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-04-14 | Assigned to Environmental Health Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Steans | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-04-01 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Consumer Protection; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Consumer Protection | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-23 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended Consumer Protection; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2009-03-11 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Consumer Protection | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-10 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Consumer Protection | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather Steans |