IL SB1767 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Cargo Transportation Tax Act. Provides that a tax is imposed upon each retailer that transports by common carrier tangible personal property into the State from a point outside of the State. Provides that the tax is imposed at the rate of 0.5% of the retail selling price of the tangible personal property. Provides that proceeds from the tax imposed by the Act shall be deposited into the Cargo Transportation Tax Fund, a special fund created in the State treasury. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by the Department of Transportation for road projects in areas of the State that receive heightened levels of traffic as a result of the transportation of tangible personal property. Effective immediately.
Title
CARGO TRANSPORTATION TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Revenue |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachel Ventura |