IL SB1760 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Wrongful Discharge from Employment Act. Provides that a discharge from employment is wrongful if it (1) was a constructive discharge, (2) was in retaliation for the employee's refusal to violate public policy or for reporting a violation of public policy, (3) was not for good cause and the employee had completed the employer's probationary period for employment, or (4) the employer violated the express provisions of its written personnel policy. Provides remedies for wrongful discharge. Authorizes civil actions and provides for arbitration. Prohibits blacklisting. Defines terms. Provides that an employer that violates the Act is guilty of a Class A misdemeanor.
Title
WRONGFUL DISCHARGE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 010-006-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1760&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1760.htm |