IL SB1759 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that a Department of Corrections issued identification card, in addition to other government-issued identification, shall be sufficient to provide accurate information of the person's residence for purposes of registration or renewal under the Act. Provides that if an offender is released from custody and placed in a hospital, nursing home, or other in-patient facility required as a condition of mandatory release or probation, the person shall register that address as his or her fixed residence. Provides that a person that has been adjudicated to be a sexually dangerous or is a sexually violent person and is later released, or found to be no longer sexually dangerous or no longer a sexually violent person and discharged, or convicted of a violation of the Act after July 1, 2005, shall register (rather than report) in person to the law enforcement agency with whom he or she last registered no later than 90 days after the date of his or her last registration and every 90 days thereafter and at such other times at the request of the law enforcement agency not to exceed 4 times a year. Provides that any other person who is required to register under the Article shall register (rather than report) in person to the appropriate law enforcement agency with whom he or she last registered within one year from the date of last registration and every year thereafter and at such other times at the request of the law enforcement agency not to exceed 4 times a year.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REPORT/RESIDENCE
Sponsors
Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |