IL SB1753 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that the professional personnel consulted by the court are subject to subpoena for the purposes of discovery, trial, or both. Provides that the court shall allocate the costs and fees of those professional personnel between the parties based upon the financial ability of each party and other appropriate criteria. Provides that upon the request of any party or upon the court's own motion, the court may conduct a hearing as to the reasonableness of those fees and costs.
Title
DISSOL-CUSTODY-COURT WITNESS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0047 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-05-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 3, 2011 |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2011 |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 5 | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |