IL SB1747 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-31 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-31 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the County Jail Good Behavior Allowance Act. Provides that if a lawsuit is filed by a person confined in a county jail, whether serving a term of imprisonment or confined pending trial or sentencing, against the sheriff or county, or against any of their officers or employees, and the court makes a specific finding that a pleading, motion, or other paper filed by the prisoner is frivolous, the warden may revoke up to 180 days of good behavior allowance under the Act. Provides that if the person has not accumulated 180 days of good behavior allowance at the time of the finding, then the warden may revoke all of the good behavior allowance accumulated by the prisoner. Defines "frivolous" and "lawsuit".
Title
JAIL INMATE-FRIVOLOUS LAWSUIT
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-29 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-002-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-002-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-001-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-001-002 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-003-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 130 | 3.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |