IL SB1739 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nuclear Safety Law of 2004. Repeals a provision authorizing community water supplies to request that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency (IEMA) perform analytical services to determine compliance with contaminant levels for radionuclides as specified in State or federal drinking water regulations. Effective immediately.
Title
NUCLEAR SAFETY-DRINKING WATER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0083 |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 20, 2015 |
2015-07-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3310 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |